Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association Nd, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nelson &Amp; Kennard, against Singh, Avinash, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beauchesne, Roger M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeauchesne, Roger M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2012 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Full | |
August 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Trial Before Evidence | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.