Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing Ii, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clark, Rory W, Esq., against Spiller, Kurtis, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Williamsen, Nancy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliamsen, Nancy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2010 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Court Trial Before Evidence | |
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Denied | |
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint | |
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.