Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Patenaude, Raymond A, Esq., against Tumlinson, Blanca, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Ameral, Ann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmeral, Ann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2008 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Full | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint | |
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.