Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sanchez, Jesenia, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Lynne R. Meredith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynne R. Meredith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2009 |
CategoryTraffic: Juvenile Infractions |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Anaya, Robert |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear MSB | |
May 23, 2010 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
May 23, 2010 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.