Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ortiz Cervantes, Julio Cesar, Lopez, Leticia Adriana, Cervantes, Avery Cristiano, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 |
Avery Cristiano Cervantes
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - Avery Cristiano Cervantes scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Ortiz Cervantes, Julio Cesar Application for Waiver granted in full. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Lopez, Leticia Adriana on 08/31/2021. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Ortiz Cervantes, Julio Cesar on 08/31/2021. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Lopez, Leticia Adriana; Ortiz Cervantes, Julio Cesar; Cervantes, Avery Cristiano on 08/31/2021. Filed By: Lopez, Leticia Adriana(Petitioner) | Cervantes, Avery Cristiano(Petitioner) | Ortiz Cervantes, Julio Cesar(Petitioner) | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted) filed by Lopez, Leticia Adriana on 08/31/2021. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Lopez, Leticia Adriana Application for Waiver granted in full. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.