Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stemmy Storage Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Baker, Cory T, against G&Amp;R Hammer Construction, G&R Hammer Construction, represented by Ramirez, Gregory J., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Paul W. Baelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul W. Baelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2021 |
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
||
September 07, 2021 |
time estimate 3 hours
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
||
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference re Settlement - scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 27 was vacated.
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (Conditional Completion Date March 8, 2023) filed by Stemmy Storage LLC on 09/03/2021. | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Entry of Judgment submitted by Stemmy Storage LLC rejected on 09/01/2021. | |
August 30, 2021 |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
||
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer - time estimate 3 hours scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 27 was vacated.
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference re Settlement - scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 27 at Ventura.
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing (UD) heard 08/30/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer scheduled on 09/07/21 is vacated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.