Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ismay, Michelle, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Hawkins, Nancy, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Hawkins, Nancy on 08/13/2021. | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Ismay, Michelle on 08/05/2021. | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 34.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Ismay, Michelle on 07/23/2021. | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment filed by Ismay, Michelle on 07/23/2021. | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Ismay, Michelle on 07/23/2021. | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Ismay, Michelle on 07/23/2021. | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Ismay, Michelle on 07/23/2021. Filed By: Ismay, Michelle(Petitioner) Refers To: Hawkins, Nancy(Respondent) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.