Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Howe, Athena, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Bradley, Brittany, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Notice of court hearing, TRO etc.) filed by Howe, Athena on 07/27/2021. | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 34.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment filed by Howe, Athena on 07/21/2021. | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (GRANTED) filed by Howe, Athena on 07/21/2021. | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Howe, Athena on 07/21/2021. Filed By: Howe, Athena(Petitioner) Refers To: Bradley, Brittany(Respondent) | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Howe, Athena on 07/21/2021. | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Howe, Athena on 07/21/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.