Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Majer, Julie Marjorie, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 |
In the Matter of Majer
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
||
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Majer, Julie Marjorie on 08/30/2021. | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (7/22/21, 7/29/21, 8/5/21, 8/12/21) filed by Majer, Julie Marjorie on 08/13/2021. | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - In the Matter of Majer scheduled for 08/30/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Majer, Julie Marjorie on 07/19/2021. | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Majer, Julie Marjorie on 07/19/2021. | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Majer, Julie Marjorie on 07/19/2021. Filed By: Majer, Julie Marjorie(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.