Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mauricio, Ricardo Javier, Lopez, Stephanie Inez, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 |
In the Matter of Lopez
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (AMENDED; served OSC for Change of Name; Served to Ricardo Mauricio (Father)) filed by Lopez, Stephanie Inez; Mauricio, Ricardo Javier on 08/31/2021. | |
August 30, 2021 |
In the Matter of Lopez
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - In the Matter of Lopez scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL (of Petition for Change) filed by Lopez, Stephanie Inez; Mauricio, Ricardo Javier on 08/18/2021. | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Jul 22, 29, Aug 5, 12 2021) filed by Lopez, Stephanie Inez; Mauricio, Ricardo Javier on 08/18/2021. | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 40.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - In the Matter of Lopez scheduled for 08/30/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Lopez, Stephanie Inez on 07/19/2021. Filed By: Lopez, Stephanie Inez(Petitioner) | Mauricio, Ricardo Javier(Petitioner) | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Lopez, Stephanie Inez Application for Waiver granted in full. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.