We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

In The Matter Of Braget

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago ago

On July 01, 2021 a Petitions - Other case was filed in the jurisdiction of Ventura County.

Case Details

Filing Date

July 01, 2021

Last Refreshed

August 02, 2021

Filing Location

Ventura County, CA

Category

Petitions - Other

Practice Area

Civil

Matter Type

General Civil

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (GAL Gina Braget) filed by Braget, Adeline on 07/08/2021.
Docket Event Case assigned to Department 43.
Docket Event Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account submitted by Braget, Gina rejected on 07/01/2021.
Docket Event Petition for Approval of Compromise Claim of Minor filed by Braget, Gina on 07/01/2021. Filed By: Braget, Gina(Petitioner) Refers To: Braget, Adeline(Claimant)
Docket Event Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Braget, Gina on 07/01/2021.
Docket Event Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor (SHC) - as to minor Adeline Braget scheduled for 08/02/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.
as to minor Adeline Braget
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.