Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Applegate, Christiane Lange, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lee, Larry W, against Seed Beauty Llc, Colour Pop Disc Company, represented by Light, Jonathan Fraser, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin F. Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | (Further) | ||
September 13, 2022 | Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and Stay Paga Claim Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4; M... | ||
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Stay of Proceedings) filed by Seed Beauty LLC; Colour Pop Disc Company on 07/26/2022. | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case submitted by Seed Beauty LLC; Colour Pop Disc Company rejected on 07/25/2022. | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 07/25/2022. | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel - Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and Stay Paga Claim Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4; Memorandum of Points and Authorities scheduled for 09/13/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura. | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Marc Polansky in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and For Stay of Paga Claim Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4) filed by Seed Beauty LLC; Colour Pop Disc Company on 07/21/2022. | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Jessica Sanchez in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and Stay Paga Claim Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4) filed by Seed Beauty LLC; Colour Pop Disc Company on 07/21/2022. | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel (Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and Stay Paga Claim Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4; Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Seed Beauty LLC; Colour Pop Disc Company on 07/21/2022. | |
July 05, 2022 | and Status of Mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.