We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Summers Vs City Of Oxnard

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago ago

On June 21, 2021 a Misc Complaints - Other case was filed in the jurisdiction of Ventura County.

Case Details

Filing Date

June 21, 2021

Last Refreshed

September 27, 2021

Filing Location

Ventura County, CA

Category

Misc Complaints - Other

Practice Area

Civil

Matter Type

General Civil

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (signed by Kelly, Assistant City Attorney & Counsel for Defendant Bryan Yanez) filed by Summers, Robert on 09/08/2021.
Docket Event Petition - Other (For leave to file action against the city of Oxnard and employees; Memorandum of points and authorities in support;Declaration (Gov Code 946.6)) filed by Summers, Robert on 06/21/2021. Filed By: Summers, Robert(Petitioner) Refers To: Hill, John(Respondent) | City of Oxnard(Respondent) | Yanez, Bryan(Respondent) | Hart, Dave(Respondent)
Docket Event Case assigned to Department 42.
Docket Event Proof of Service - PERSONAL (served Minute Order; Petition for Leave to File Action; Memo of Points & Authorities in Support; Dec of Benjamin A Sampson; Notice of Case Assignment) filed by Summers, Robert on 07/02/2021.
Docket Event Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Simone Seydoux, Assistant City Clerk) filed by Summers, Robert on 08/18/2021.
[leave to Petitioner to file complaint against City of Oxnard]
Docket Event Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Summers, Robert on 08/09/2021.
Docket Event Notice - Other (of Taking Off Calendar Plaintiff's Petition for Leave to File Action Against the City of Oxnard and Exployees John Hill, Dave Hart and Bryan Yanez; Declaration of Benjamin A Sampson) filed by Summers, Robert on 08/09/2021.
Docket Event Summons issued on 08/09/2021.
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.