Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tobias, Gabriella, Noriega, Amaris, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 |
as to Amaris Noriega
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
||
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor (SHC) - as to Amaris Noriega scheduled for 07/22/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 41.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Approval of Compromise Claim of Minor filed by Tobias, Gabriella on 06/21/2021. Filed By: Tobias, Gabriella(Petitioner) Refers To: Noriega, Amaris(Claimant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.