Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Mcgrath, Sofia, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Garner, Dana, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with John R. Smiley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn R. Smiley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Denied. | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Denied. | |
June 28, 2021 |
Judge: John R. Smiley |
||
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (DENIED) filed by McGrath, Sofia on 06/07/2021. | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 31 effective 06/07/2021.
Judge: John R. Smiley |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 31 at Ventura.
Judge: John R. Smiley |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to John Smiley effective 06/07/2021. | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by McGrath, Sofia on 06/03/2021. | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by McGrath, Sofia on 06/03/2021. Filed By: McGrath, Sofia(Petitioner) Refers To: Garner, Dana(Respondent) | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment filed by McGrath, Sofia on 06/03/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.