Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lacour, Lucien, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Reardon, Matt, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration (of Lucien Lacour in Support of Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders against Respondent Matt Reardon) filed by Lacour, Lucien on 06/24/2021. | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Notice of court hearing, TRO etc.) filed by Lacour, Lucien on 06/16/2021. | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Lacour, Lucien on 06/02/2021. | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Lacour, Lucien on 06/02/2021. | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 34.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment filed by Lacour, Lucien on 06/01/2021. | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Lacour, Lucien on 06/01/2021. Filed By: Lacour, Lucien(Petitioner) Refers To: Reardon, Matt(Respondent) | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Lacour, Lucien on 06/01/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.