Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Robert Lopez Jr On Behalf Of Himself And All Similar Situated Employees, Lopez, Robert Jr, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Gross, Joseph A, against Oxnard Wings Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin F. Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 |
(Further Status)
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
||
November 15, 2022 |
Re: Mr. Rose's failure to appear
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
||
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 11/15/2022 08:30:00 AM. | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Daniel Ginzburg in Response to Order to Show Cause Hearing) filed by Robert Lopez Jr on behalf of himself and all similar situated employees on 09/16/2022. | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Adam Rose in Response to Order to Show Cause) filed by Robert Lopez Jr on behalf of himself and all similar situated employees on 09/16/2022. | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM) - Re: Mr. Rose's failure to appear scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference re Settlement - (Further Status) scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Status Conference re Settlement heard 09/15/2022 08:30:00 AM. | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Robert Lopez Jr on behalf of himself and all similar situated employees on 09/12/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.