Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Arteaga, Mario, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Herbert, Joseph, against United Parcel Service Inc, United Parcel Service, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Case #2:21-cv-6011) filed by United Parcel Service; United Parcel Service Inc on 07/26/2021. | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Patajo, Emily T added as a effective 07/23/2021. | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer filed by United Parcel Service; United Parcel Service Inc on 07/23/2021. | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served upon Lai Saevang, Authorized to Accept for Agent CSC Lawyers) filed by Arteaga, Mario on 07/12/2021. | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 21.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arteaga, Mario on 05/26/2021. | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Arteaga, Mario on 05/26/2021. Filed By: Arteaga, Mario(Plaintiff) Refers To: United Parcel Service Inc(Defendant) | United Parcel Service(Defendant) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons issued on 05/26/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.