Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gonzalez, Rafael Marquez filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
The death certificate for the decedent indicates that his spouse survived him. If so, it appears that Paragraph 5.a(2)(b) is incorrectly answered. Paragraph 5.a(3) or (4) and (7) and (8) of the petiti...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. heard 07/01/2021 10:30:00 AM. | |
July 01, 2021 | |||
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (for 07.01.21) filed by Rose-Garcia, Kimberly on 06/24/2021. | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Rose-Garcia, Kimberly on 06/08/2021. | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (for 07.01.21) filed by Rose-Garcia, Kimberly on 06/04/2021. | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department J6. | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Rose-Garcia, Kimberly on 05/26/2021. Filed By: Rose-Garcia, Kimberly(Proposed Administrator) Refers To: Gonzalez, Rafael(Decedent) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 07/01/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.