Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Macdougall, Linda, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Templeman, Brett C., against City Of Port Hueneme, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | 5 day time estimate | ||
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - 5 day time estimate scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 08/29/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 at Ventura.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference heard 12/19/2022 08:30:00 AM. | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement) filed by MacDougall, Linda on 12/16/2022. | |
December 12, 2022 |
Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference - scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference heard 11/04/2022 09:53:00 AM. | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference - scheduled for 12/20/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 12/12/2022 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.