Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ruiz Chavez, Yolanda, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Chavez Posada, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Michael Lief presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Lief Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 |
Judge: Michael Lief |
||
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Ruiz Chavez, Yolanda on 05/28/2021. | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/29/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Ruiz Chavez, Yolanda on 05/21/2021. | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Ruiz Chavez, Yolanda on 05/21/2021. | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 32.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Ruiz Chavez, Yolanda on 05/20/2021. Filed By: Ruiz Chavez, Yolanda(Petitioner) Refers To: Chavez Posada, Jesse(Respondent) | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Ruiz Chavez, Yolanda on 05/20/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.