Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Tinker, Mackenzie Grant, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Paul W. Baelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul W. Baelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 |
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
||
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Release from Firearm Prohibition / Hearing for Relief from Firearm Prohibition - scheduled for 07/12/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 was vacated.
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
|
June 28, 2021 |
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
||
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Release from Firearm Prohibition / Hearing for Relief from Firearm Prohibition scheduled on 7/12/2021 is vacated. | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference RE: Weapons Cases - scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 at Ventura.
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Release from Firearm Prohibition / Hearing for Relief from Firearm Prohibition - scheduled for 07/12/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 at Ventura.
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 27.
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Hearing for Relief from Firearms Prohibition Welfare & Institutions Code 8103 f 5 filed by Tinker, Mackenzie Grant on 05/12/2021. Filed By: Tinker, Mackenzie Grant(Respondent) Refers To: Department of Justice(Interested Party) | The People of the State of California(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.