Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Park, Seong Wook, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2021 |
In the Matter of Park
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
||
June 24, 2021 |
In the Matter of Park
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
||
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (5/28, 6/4, 6/11, 6/18/21 Tri County Sentry) filed by Park, Seong Wook on 06/24/2021. | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - In the Matter of Park scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance VENTURA generated. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - In the Matter of Park scheduled for 06/24/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Park, Seong Wook on 05/12/2021. Filed By: Park, Seong Wook(Petitioner) | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Park, Seong Wook on 05/12/2021. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Park, Seong Wook on 05/12/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.