Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lopez, Rosario Elizabeth, Garcia, Cristian Carmelo, Garcia, Carlos Giovanni, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 |
In the Matter of Lopez
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Due Diligence (Re: Attempts to Locate Parent for NOtice of Change of Name of a Minor (CCP 1277; CRC 7.52)) filed by Lopez, Rosario Elizabeth on 06/18/2021. | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (May 20, 27 , June 03, 10 2021) filed by Lopez, Rosario Elizabeth; Garcia, Carlos Giovanni; Garcia, Cristian Carmelo on 06/11/2021. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - In the Matter of Lopez scheduled for 06/24/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Lopez, Rosario Elizabeth; Garcia, Carlos Giovanni; Garcia, Cristian Carmelo on 05/12/2021. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment VENTURA generated. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) filed by Lopez, Rosario Elizabeth on 05/12/2021. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Lopez, Rosario Elizabeth Application for Waiver granted in full. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lopez, Rosario Elizabeth; Garcia, Carlos Giovanni; Garcia, Cristian Carmelo on 05/12/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.