Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Murray, Alexa, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Booth, Rebekah P, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 10/08/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 10/08/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
October 01, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted) filed by Murray, Alexa on 10/01/2021. | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 10/01/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 10/01/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
July 21, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted) filed by Murray, Alexa on 07/21/2021. | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 07/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.