Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tull, Amanda Jan, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 |
Amanda Jan Tull
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (5/6/21, 5/13/21, 5/20/21, 5/27/21; Fillmore Gazette) filed by Tull, Amanda Jan on 05/28/2021. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - Amanda Jan Tull scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tull, Amanda Jan on 04/30/2021. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Tull, Amanda Jan on 04/30/2021. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Tull, Amanda Jan on 04/30/2021. Filed By: Tull, Amanda Jan(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.