Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nguyen, My Gia, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Cervantes, Miguel, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) ((Amended POS to correct plaintiff's mailing address)) filed by Nguyen, My Gia on 05/25/2021. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Notice of court hearing, TRO etc.) filed by Nguyen, My Gia on 05/12/2021. | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) submitted by Nguyen, My Gia rejected on 05/10/2021. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 34.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Nguyen, My Gia on 04/30/2021. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Nguyen, My Gia on 04/30/2021. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment filed by Nguyen, My Gia on 04/30/2021. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Nguyen, My Gia on 04/30/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.