Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Simonson, Christine Lee, Mccauley, Jake David, Mccauley Simonson, Elliott Lee, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2021 |
in the matter of minor Elliott Lee McCauley Simonson
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (4/28/21, 5/5/21, 5/12/21, 5/19/21) filed by McCauley Simonson, Elliott Lee; McCauley, Jake David; Simonson, Christine Lee on 05/24/2021. | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - in the matter of minor Elliott Lee McCauley Simonson scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Simonson, Christine Lee; McCauley, Jake David; McCauley Simonson, Elliott Lee on 04/23/2021. | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Simonson, Christine Lee; McCauley, Jake David; McCauley Simonson, Elliott Lee on 04/23/2021. | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Simonson, Christine Lee; McCauley, Jake David; McCauley Simonson, Elliott Lee on 04/23/2021. Filed By: Simonson, Christine Lee(Petitioner) | McCauley Simonson, Elliott Lee(Petitioner) | McCauley, Jake David(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.