Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Peachtree Settlement Funding Llc, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 |
for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights by and Between J.L. and Peachtree Settlement Funding, LL...
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
||
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mailing (Verified Petition & supporting documents) filed by Peachtree Settlement Funding LLC on 04/26/2021. | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Other - for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights by and Between J.L. and Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, Pursuant to Cal Ins Code 10134 et seq. scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition - Other (for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights by and Between J.L and Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, Pursuant to Cal Ins Code 10134 et seq) filed by Peachtree Settlement Funding LLC on 04/21/2021. Filed By: Peachtree Settlement Funding LLC(Petitioner) Refers To: L, J(Interested Party) | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (on Petition for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights By and Between J.L. and Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, Pursuant to Cal Ins Code 10134 et seq.) filed by Peachtree Settlement Funding LLC on 04/21/2021. | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Peachtree Settlement Funding LLC on 04/21/2021. | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of J.L. in Support of Petitioner's Petition for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights by and Between J.L. and Petitioner Pursuant to Cal Ins Code 10134 et seq.) filed by Peachtree Settlement Funding LLC on 04/21/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.