Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Blythe, Darrell, Warren, Samantha D, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Warren, Samantha D, Blythe, Darly, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 06/22/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/22/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
June 17, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Blythe, Darrell on 06/17/2021. | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Warren, Samantha D on 06/17/2021. | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (Amended CH-120 Response to Request for CHRO) filed by Warren, Samantha D on 06/03/2021. | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (AMENDED) filed by Warren, Samantha D on 06/03/2021. | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/17/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 06/17/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
May 28, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.