Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jantzen, Michael Gordon, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Jantzen, Lance Robert, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Michael Lief presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Lief Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 |
Judge: Michael Lief |
||
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (EA-100 Request for Elder Abuse Restraining Order; EA-109 Notice of Court Hearing; EA-110 TRO; etc) filed by Jantzen, Michael Gordon on 04/19/2021. | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 32.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Jantzen, Michael Gordon on 04/16/2021. | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Jantzen, Michael Gordon on 04/16/2021. | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Jantzen, Michael Gordon on 04/16/2021. Filed By: Jantzen, Michael Gordon(Petitioner) Refers To: Jantzen, Lance(Respondent) | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Jantzen, Michael Gordon on 04/16/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.