Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lambert, Judith Darlene, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Stepanek, Erik William, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Michael Lief presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Lief Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2021 |
Judge: Michael Lief |
||
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 05/25/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 05/25/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
May 18, 2021 |
Judge: Michael Lief |
||
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted) filed by Lambert, Judith Darlene on 05/18/2021. | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (of Cancelled service) filed by Lambert, Judith Darlene on 05/04/2021. | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 32.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Lambert, Judith Darlene on 04/13/2021. | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Lambert, Judith Darlene on 04/13/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.