Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ojai Villa Mobile Estates Lp, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Coy, Roshana, Doe, John, Pence, Charles, Roe, Jane, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2021 |
for Petitioner
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
August 13, 2021 |
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (JOINT; to Withdraw Mutual Motions for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs and Mutual Memorandum of Costs) filed by Ojai Villa Mobile Estates LP on 08/12/2021. | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs (CLM) - scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 was vacated.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM) - for Petitioner scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 was vacated.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 07/22/2021. | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Attorney Fees (and Costs) filed by Pence, Charles on 07/22/2021. | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of James Scafide) filed by Pence, Charles on 07/22/2021. | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs (CLM) - scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Tyler Sprague) filed by Pence, Charles on 07/22/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.