Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Merino, Ronald, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Williams, Donald, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 08/16/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 34 was vacated.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (to Issuance of Restraining Orders) filed by Merino, Ronald on 07/27/2021. | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Granted. | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) (Restraining Order Expires: 07/08/2024) filed by Merino, Ronald on 07/27/2021. | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order submitted by Merino, Ronald rejected on 07/21/2021. | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order submitted by Williams, Donald rejected on 07/19/2021. | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 08/16/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 08/16/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.