Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ramirez, Alejandro, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2021 |
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
||
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (04/22; 04/29; 05/06; 05/13/2021; Fillmore Gazette) filed by Ramirez, Alejandro on 05/17/2021. | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 06/07/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 21.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Ramirez, Alejandro on 04/08/2021. Filed By: Ramirez, Alejandro(Petitioner) | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Ramirez, Alejandro on 04/08/2021. | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez, Alejandro on 04/08/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.