Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Startz, Jon, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Panossian, Natalie A, against Joynes, Samipa, Joynes, Matthew, represented by Norris, Cameron, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin F. Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2021 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | for Reclassification Pursuant to CCP Sec 403.040 to an Unlimited Civil Matter and For Leave to File ... | ||
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other (CLM) heard 12/02/2021 08:20:00 AM. | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition (to Motion for Reclassification and for Leave to Amend, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof) filed by Joynes, Matthew; Joynes, Samipa on 11/19/2021. | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Court of Appeal or Supreme Court) (Granted) filed by Startz, Jon on 11/04/2021. | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated. | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Startz, Jon Application for Waiver granted in full. | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (for Reclassification Pursuant to CCP Sec 403.040 to an Unlimited Civil Matter and For Leave to File a First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Attorney Natalie Panossian-Bassler) filed by Startz, Jon on 11/04/2021. | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Startz, Jon on 11/04/2021. | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (Notice of Motion and Motion to Reclassify to Unlimited Case) filed by Startz, Jon on 11/04/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.