Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Berg-Gankas, Bridget Brenda, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Greminger, Rocky, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (CH-100 Request for CH Restraining Order; CH-109 Notice of Court Hearing, CH-110 TRO; ETC) filed by Berg-Gankas, Bridget Brenda on 02/17/2021. | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 34.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 03/03/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Berg-Gankas, Bridget Brenda on 02/08/2021. Filed By: Berg-Gankas, Bridget Brenda(Petitioner) Refers To: Greminger, Rocky(Respondent) | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Berg-Gankas, Bridget Brenda on 02/08/2021. | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Berg-Gankas, Bridget Brenda on 02/08/2021. | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment filed by Berg-Gankas, Bridget Brenda on 02/08/2021. | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Berg-Gankas, Bridget Brenda on 02/08/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.