Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Flores, Abel, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Campos, Henry Ezekiel, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS) served on Defendant. Copy forwarded to Sheriff for entry in CLETS filed by Flores, Abel on 02/24/2021. | |
February 19, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Flores, Abel on 02/19/2021. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Granted. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested is granted, order expires 02/19/2024 at 3 p.m. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential CLETS Information CLETS 001 received and scanned into CCPOR for transmittal to Law Enforcement. | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Flores, Abel on 01/25/2021. | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Flores, Abel on 01/22/2021. | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.