Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rezinas, Matthew P, Rezinas, Emma Kathleen, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 |
as to Emma Kathleen Rezinas
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
||
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor (SHC) - as to Emma Kathleen Rezinas scheduled for 02/16/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action (Minor) filed by Rezinas, Matthew P on 01/15/2021. Filed By: Rezinas, Matthew P(Petitioner) Refers To: Rezinas, Emma(Claimant) | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Matthew P Rezinas) filed by Rezinas, Matthew P on 01/13/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.