Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sv Marketplace Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Taylor, Corey E, against Dhanjal, Sandeep, Dhanjal, Inderpreet, Bhachu, Amrik Singh, represented by Diaz, Manuel J., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by SV Marketplace LLC on 08/27/2021. | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (Filed No Later than 12/31/2021) filed by SV Marketplace LLC on 07/12/2021. | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (12/31/21) filed by SV Marketplace LLC on 07/08/2021. | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Bhachu, Amrik Singh; Dhanjal, Inderpreet; Dhanjal, Sandeep on 03/25/2021. | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment VENTURA generated. | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by SV Marketplace LLC on 01/04/2021. Filed By: SV Marketplace LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bhachu, Amrik(Defendant) | Dhanjal, Inderpreet(Defendant) | Dhanjal, Sandeep(Defendant) | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SV Marketplace LLC on 01/04/2021. | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.