Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mcgaffey, David, against De Villa, Richelle Ann M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (no later than 11-02-2023) filed by Midland Credit Management Inc on 11/05/2021. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Frederick De Los Santos, Brother in Law, Co-Resident) filed by Midland Credit Management Inc on 02/19/2021. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 41.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Midland Credit Management Inc on 12/18/2020. Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: De Villa, Richelle(Defendant) | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Venue) filed by Midland Credit Management Inc on 12/18/2020. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management Inc on 12/18/2020. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Midland Credit Management Inc on 12/18/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.