Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sebourn, Thomas J, against Campos, Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank on 11/05/2021. | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service (Summons; complaint) filed by Discover Bank on 02/09/2021. | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service (Case Initiating Documents) filed by Discover Bank on 02/05/2021. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue (CCP 395(b)) filed by Discover Bank on 12/18/2020. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 12/18/2020. Filed By: Discover Bank(Plaintiff) Refers To: Campos, Antonio(Defendant) | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank on 12/18/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.