Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Onemain Financial Group Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Sosa, Lorenzo J, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 07/02/2021. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (1-10) filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC on 03/29/2021. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment) filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC on 03/29/2021. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk received from OneMain Financial Group LLC on 03/29/2021 | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment for OneMain Financial Group LLC against Sosa, Lorenzo J in the amount of: 11739.31 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 447.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 03/29/2021. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Military Status (and Notice Pursuant to CCP 1033(b)(2)) filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC on 03/29/2021. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Promissory Note and Transaction History) filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC on 03/29/2021. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Sosa, Lorenzo J on Complaint. | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC on 02/09/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.