Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kidd, Adam, against Schroeder, Matthew M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 06/04/2021. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 05/12/2021. | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Counsel; RE Waiver of Interest; Waiver of Costs and Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed by CITIBANK NA on 04/01/2021. | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by CITIBANK NA on 04/01/2021. | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (& Clerks Judgment) filed by CITIBANK NA on 04/01/2021. | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by CITIBANK NA on 04/01/2021. | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment for CITIBANK NA against Schroeder, Matthew M in the amount of: 4791.59 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 292.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 04/01/2021. | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Schroeder, Matthew M on Complaint. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served 02-08-21) filed by CITIBANK NA on 02/16/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.