Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sandoval, Diana C, Sandoval, Antonio, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Nomi, Brian, against Lopez, Sergio, Chavez, Veronica, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Paul W. Baelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul W. Baelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Satisfied) filed by Sandoval, Antonio; Sandoval, Diana C on 04/01/2021. | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession filed by Sandoval, Antonio; Sandoval, Diana C on 02/09/2021. | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 02/09/2021. | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment for Sandoval, Antonio ;Sandoval, Diana C against Chavez, Veronica ;Lopez, Sergio in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 02/05/2021. | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Sandoval, Antonio; Sandoval, Diana C on 02/05/2021. | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Sandoval, Antonio; Sandoval, Diana C on 01/28/2021. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (subserved to Jose Lopez (subtenant)) filed by Sandoval, Antonio; Sandoval, Diana C on 01/28/2021. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Lopez, Sergio on Complaint. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants (PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION) filed by Sandoval, Antonio; Sandoval, Diana C on 01/28/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.