Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Baldaro, Aaron, against Torres, Norma, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment for American Express National Bank against Torres, Norma in the amount of: 6778.77 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 293.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 05/07/2021. | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by American Express National Bank on 05/07/2021. | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by American Express National Bank on 05/07/2021. | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (1-10) filed by American Express National Bank on 05/07/2021. | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (& Clerks judgment) filed by American Express National Bank on 05/07/2021. | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Torres, Norma on Complaint. | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Pablo Cruz Member of Household) filed by American Express National Bank on 02/17/2021. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 40.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express National Bank on 12/18/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.