Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Singer, Tami L, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryTrust Proceedings |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling filed by Singer, Tami L on 03/08/2021. | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Determining Assets of Trust) filed by Singer, Tami L on 02/24/2021. | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition - Amended has been Granted. | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case closed. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition - Amended (to Determine Assets of Trust) filed by Singer, Tami L on 02/16/2021. Filed By: Singer, Tami L(Petitioner) | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition - Other (to Determine Assets of Trust) filed by Singer, Tami L on 12/18/2020. Filed By: Singer, Tami L(Petitioner) | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department J6. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.