Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Degenaro, Kimberly Ann, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2021 |
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
||
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by DeGenaro, Kimberly Ann on 03/05/2021. | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Published 2/11/21, 2/18/21, 2/25/21 and 3/04/21) filed by DeGenaro, Kimberly Ann on 03/05/2021. | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 03/05/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 41.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by DeGenaro, Kimberly Ann on 12/18/2020. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by DeGenaro, Kimberly Ann on 12/18/2020. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by DeGenaro, Kimberly Ann on 12/18/2020. Filed By: DeGenaro, Kimberly Ann(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.