Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lino, Alma, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Robinson, Desiree Lino, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William Q. Liebmann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam Q. Liebmann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2021 | |||
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (EA-100 Request for Elder Abuse Restraining Order; EA-109 Notice of Court Hearing; EA-110 TRO; ETC.) filed by Lino, Alma on 12/24/2020. | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - scheduled for 12/21/2020 at 11:30:00 AM in 33 at Ventura.
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 33.
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 01/05/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
|
December 21, 2020 |
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
||
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Lino, Alma on 12/21/2020. Filed By: Lino, Alma(Petitioner) Refers To: Robinson, Desiree(Respondent) | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Lino, Alma on 12/21/2020. | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Lino, Alma on 12/21/2020. | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Lino, Alma on 12/21/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.