Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Baldaro, Aaron, against Oliveras, Shirin, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express National Bank on 02/25/2021. | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Due Diligence filed by American Express National Bank on 02/17/2021. | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express National Bank on 12/17/2020. | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by American Express National Bank on 12/17/2020. Filed By: American Express National Bank(Plaintiff) Refers To: Oliveras, Shirin(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.